PARISH LANDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We are able to make small cash grants for the relief of poverty for residents within the Parish of Exminster, Devon. Please do not contact us if the request for assistance relates to someone who lives outside of the Parish of Exminster.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Devon
Governance
- 20 November 1962: Standard registration
- EXMINSTER FEOFFEES (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAROLE ANN SMITH | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rev Vanessa Jane Pestridge | Trustee | 09 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elaine Margaret Coles | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosalyn Ann Kukor | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alison Starkey | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Valerie Trickett | Trustee | 25 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
DEREK JOHN MADGE | Trustee | 18 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
David Victor Nappin | Trustee | 01 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
Peter Richard March | Trustee | 01 February 2015 |
|
|
||||
ROSEMARY SYLVIA SANDERS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Chris Hodgson | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BARBARA EDMUND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.18k | £2.37k | £1.31k | £1.90k | £1.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £771 | £1.71k | £1.75k | £1.02k | £1.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 08 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 20 NOV 1894 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 27 SEP 1910
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PARISH AND THE POOR OF THE PARISH OF EXMINSTER.
Area of benefit
EXMINSTER
Linked charities
- 20 November 1962 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 DRYFIELD
EXMINSTER
EXETER
EX6 8DJ
- Phone:
- 07706095633
- Email:
- exminster.feoffees@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window