KEATS - SHELLEY MEMORIAL ASSOCIATION (INCORPORATED)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To facilitate appreciation of the works of the two Poets John Keats and Percy Bysshe Shelley and their circle; To keep the House in Rome as a memorial to them by way of a museum and library available to the public; To preserve books and articles linked with the two Poets; To take care of the graves in Rome of the two Poets; To generally preserve the memory and works of the two Poets.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£596,770
Donations and legacies | £69.82k | |
Charitable activities | £229.18k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £297.77k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£491,573
Raising funds | £60.71k | |
Charitable activities | £429.52k | |
Other | £1.34k |
£37,491 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £62.05k | |
Charitable expenditure | £429.52k | |
Retained for future use | £105.20k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £62.05k | |
Charitable expenditure | £429.52k | |
Retained for future use | £142.69k |
People

8 Employee(s)
17 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
- Italy
- United States
Governance
- 19 December 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
17 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Laura Savio Foster | Trustee | 03 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Thursfield | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Joseph Spence | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anna Mercer | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Adrian Earle | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Anna Camilleri | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Reeta Chakrabarti | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|||||
Bathsheba Morabito | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Beehan | Trustee | 19 June 2018 |
|
|
||||
Joe Bates | Trustee | 19 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Lord Harry James Abinger | Trustee | 19 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Earl of Woolton | Trustee | 25 March 2015 |
|
|||||
Dr James Michael Grande | Trustee | 08 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Robert inglis Gardner | Trustee | 11 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID LEIGH-HUNT | Trustee | 09 December 1992 |
|
|||||
DEBORAH HODGES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHARLES CARY-ELWES FCA MIT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £399.27k | £376.92k | £431.33k | £535.50k | £596.77k | |
|
Total expenditure | £445.49k | £418.17k | £468.48k | £519.02k | £491.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £67.93k | £69.82k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £181.46k | £229.18k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £286.11k | £297.77k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £391.59k | £429.52k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £127.43k | £60.71k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £21.77k | £41.59k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £7.45k | £7.22k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £1.34k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.22m | £5.28m | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £653.67k | £683.86k | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | N/A | £271.10k | £430.16k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £115.13k | £124.91k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 31 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 01 November 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 November 2021 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 15 November 2021 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 November 2020 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23RD OCTOBER 1906
Charitable objects
TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC GENERALLY IN THE APPRECIATION OF THE WORDS OF JOHN KEATS AND PERCY BYSSHE SHELLEY AND THE WORDS OF OTHER DISTINGUISHED BRITISH AND AMERICAN WRITERS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
MARRIOTT HARRISON LLP
80 CHEAPSIDE
LONDON
EC2V 6EE
- Phone:
- 01926427400
- Email:
- hello@keats-shelley.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window