Financial history LANCASTER CHARITY

Charity Number: 213461
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £251.29k £259.80k £286.68k £298.92k £286.27k
Total expenditure £287.74k £228.69k £406.07k £381.48k £315.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A