Accounts and annual returns HARLEY'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity number: 213729
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 30 September 2024 335 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 25 September 2024 330 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 30 September 2024 700 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 25 September 2024 695 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 30 September 2024 1065 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 25 September 2024 1060 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 04 February 2021 96 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required