CATENIAN ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT AND CHILDREN'S FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of monetary assistance to members of the Catenian Association and their dependants including dependants of deceased members of the Catenian Association who are in need.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
200 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
- Australia
- Malta
- Scotland
- South Africa
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 14 January 1963: Standard registration
- CATENIAN ASSOCIATION BENEVOLENT FUNDS (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jean Harkin | Trustee | 16 January 2024 |
|
|||||||
Dr David Brinkley | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Denis Murphy | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||||
KEVIN MICHAEL RAFFERTY | Trustee | 21 July 2020 |
|
|||||||
John Colligan | Trustee | 17 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||
John Hogan | Trustee | 21 July 2015 |
|
|
||||||
David Cawdery | Trustee | 24 February 2014 |
|
|||||||
PETER JAMES PATRICK DEVINE | Trustee | 24 February 2014 |
|
|
||||||
RICHARD MARK SUTTON ALLANSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £424.12k | £1.03m | £700.41k | £894.54k | £459.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £798.68k | £726.01k | £887.31k | £763.91k | £1.31m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £116.92k | £83.62k | £72.30k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £259.37k | £289.04k | £355.46k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £649.52k | £327.76k | £466.77k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £33.08k | £7.01k | £1.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £714.46k | £874.02k | £750.92k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £11.55k | £13.29k | £12.99k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £13.26k | £9.51k | £23.86k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £11.55k | £13.29k | £12.99k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 15 March 2023 | 43 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 29/05/1991 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 18/02/2015 AS AMENDED ON 28 JUL 2016 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 09 FEB 2021
Charitable objects
THE MANAGING TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY AND, AT THEIR DISCRETION, THE WHOLE OR ANY PART OF ITS CAPITAL IN: A) RELIEVING NEED AMONGST MEMBERS OF THE CATENIAN ASSOCIATION, THE DEPENDANTS OF MEMBERS OF THE CATENIAN ASSOCIATION, THE DEPENDANTS OF FORMER MEMBERS OF THE CATENIAN ASSOCIATION AND THE DEPENDANTS OF DECEASED MEMBERS OF THE CATENIAN ASSOCIATION, WHO ARE (IN EACH CASE) IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS (THE "PRIMARY CLASS OF BENEFICIARIES"), BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING LOANS, WHETHER SECURED OR UNSECURED AND EITHER WITHOUT INTEREST OR AT SUCH RATE OF INTEREST AS THE MANAGING TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE, OR PROVIDING ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS (WHETHER BY PAYMENT FOR OR TOWARDS OR REIMBURSEMENT OF ALL OR PART OF THE COST OF SUCH ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES, OR OTHERWISE); B) IF AND TO THE EXTENT TO WHICH THE RESOURCES OF THE CHARITY ARE NOT USED FOR THE PURPOSE SET OUT IN A), RELIEVING NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AMONG OTHER MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC, BY SUPPORTING SUCH ROMAN CATHOLIC CHARITIES AS THE MANAGING TRUSTEES MAY SELECT, IN PARTICULAR BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING LOANS, WHETHER SECURED OR UNSECURED AND EITHER WITHOUT INTEREST OR AT SUCH RATE OF INTEREST AS THE MANAGING TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE; AND C) IF AND TO THE EXTENT TO WHICH THE RESOURCES OF THE CHARITY ARE NOT USED FOR THE PURPOSES SET OUT IN A) AND B), RELIEVING NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AMONG OTHER MEMBERS OF THE PUBLIC BY SUPPORTING SUCH OTHER CHARITIES AS THE MANAGING TRUSTEES MAY SELECT, IN PARTICULAR BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING LOANS, WHETHER SECURED OR UNSECURED AND EITHER WITHOUT INTEREST OR AT SUCH RATE OF INTEREST AS THE MANAGING TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Unit 5
Oak Court
Pilgrims Walk
Prologis Park
COVENTRY
CV6 4QH
- Phone:
- 01257462344
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window