Financial history MERCHANT TAYLORS' CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES FOR THE POOR

Charity Number: 214267
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £813.65k £467.78k £439.55k £439.10k £458.21k
Total expenditure £460.83k £14.76m £345.17k £371.06k £518.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £76.44k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Investment £326.69k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Other £410.53k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Legacies £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £412.56k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £48.27k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £63.12k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £349.44k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £48.27k N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A N/A N/A N/A