Financial history JOHN FEENEY CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 214486
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £74.45k £74.30k £81.41k £82.43k £109.80k
Total expenditure £68.61k £56.48k £67.45k £114.55k £116.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A