Financial history HALESWORTH UNITED CHARITIES

Charity Number: 214509
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £9.18k £7.20k £7.57k £10.63k £8.47k
Total expenditure £3.60k £2.95k £3.76k £5.30k £13.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A