HUGUENOT SOCIETY OF GREAT BRITAIN AND IRELAND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Education/Training Arts/Culture Environment/Conservation/Heritage
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

20 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Ireland
- Northern Ireland
Governance
- 22 November 1965: Standard registration
- 09 October 2013: Funds received from 288302 HUGUENOT LIBRARY MAINTENANCE FUND
- THE HUGUENOT SOCIETY (Working name)
- HUGUENOT SOCIETY OF LONDON (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
20 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Katrina Matthews | Chair | 10 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
Duncan Edmonston JP | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Simon Chabot | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Victorine Martineau | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Antoinette Sarah Giraud Vermont | Trustee | 14 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
ROGER ALAN DINES | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|||||
Ann Majorie Keen MA | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clive Gwatkin Jenkins MA | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Charles Littleton | Trustee | 10 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Hampton | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ian William Stone MA | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Dara Robinson MA MCom | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diane Elizabeth Watts MA PhD | Trustee | 10 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Vivienne Margaret Larminie FRHistS | Trustee | 11 May 2021 |
|
|||||
Barbara Margaret Julien BA | Trustee | 10 May 2019 |
|
|
||||
S B de Save | Trustee | 11 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
GLYNDA DAWN EASTERBROOK | Trustee | 12 August 2011 |
|
|||||
MARTIN FREDERIC HARCOURT WILLIAMS MA FCA | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANTHONY WILSON | Trustee |
|
||||||
ANNE ELIZABETH NUGENT | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £108.25k | £75.19k | £143.40k | £112.22k | £102.73k | |
|
Total expenditure | £103.30k | £90.72k | £73.36k | £107.06k | £110.53k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 10 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
BYE-LAWS AS AMENDED 12 MAY 1965, 13 MAY 1986, 11 MAY 1994, 10 MAY 1995 , 8 MAY 1996, 17 MAY 2006 AND 7 NOVEMBER 2007 AS AMENDED ON 17 MAY 2014 as amended on 15 Jan 2020 as amended on 10 Nov 2021 as amended on 10 May 2023
Charitable objects
THE INTERCHANGE AND PUBLICATION OF KNOWLEDGE RELATING TO THE HISTORY OF THE HUGUENOTS IN FRANCE AND ADJOINING COUNTRIES. THE HUGUENOT EMIGRATIONS FROM FRANCE. THE HUGUENOT REFUGEE SETTLEMENTS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD, PARTICULARLY THOSE IN GREAT BRITAIN, IRELAND, AND THE CHANNEL ISLANDS, AND THE RESULTING EFFECTS OF THOSE SETTLEMENTS UPON THE PROFESSIONS, MANUFACTURERS, COMMERCE, ECONOMIC AND SOCIAL LIFE OF THE SEVERAL PLACES IN WHICH THEY WERE MADE. HUGUENOT GENEALOGY AND HERALDRY. THE PUBLICATION AND PRESERVATION OF ORIGINAL HUGUENOT MANUSCRIPTS, MEMOIRS, AND HUGUENOT CHURCH AND OTHER REGISTERS OF HISTORICAL INTEREST AND EDUCATIONAL VALUE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Huguenot Society
PO Box 444
RUISLIP
Middlesex
HA4 4GU
- Phone:
- 02085823895
- Email:
- admin@huguenotsociety.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window