MORDEN COLLEGE

Charity Number: 215551
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Sir John Morden's Charity: Provides living accommodation, including a Care Home and Sheltered accommodation, and financial assistance for older people. Ancillary services to support beneficiaries living in the charity's properties is also provided. Dame Susan Morden's Charity: Provides grants to further the work of the Church of England provided that parishes are within its area of benefit.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
  • Religious Activities
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Bromley
  • Greenwich

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 November 1986: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sir David Hugh Wootton Chair 13 October 2010
THE CITY ARTS TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
THE JESUS COLLEGE BOAT CLUB TRUST
Received: On time
CHARLES DICKENS CENTRE (GAD'S HILL) LIMITED
Received: On time
CROSS SECTOR SAFETY AND SECURITY COMMUNICATIONS
Received: On time
THE WOOLMEN'S COMPANY CHARITABLE INCORPORATED ORGANISATION
Received: On time
BOWYERS CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE LORD MAYOR'S 800TH ANNIVERSARY AWARDS TRUST
Received: On time
THE WORSHIPFUL COMPANY OF WOOLMEN SUSTAINABILITY START-UP & INNOVATION FUND LIMITED
Charity reporting is overdue by 20 days
THE ROCHESTER CATHEDRAL TRUST
Received: On time
ROYAL BENEVOLENT AND EDUCATIONAL FUND FOR WATERMEN AND LIGHTERMEN
Received: On time
THE COMPANY OF WATERMEN AND LIGHTERMEN OF THE RIVER THAMES POORS FUND
Received: On time
Professor Sube Banerjee MBE Trustee 11 June 2024
None on record
Alderman Gregory Jones KC Trustee 11 June 2024
None on record
Professor Gillian Manthorpe Trustee 11 March 2024
None on record
Alderman Timothy Hailes Trustee 11 March 2024
None on record
Alderman Christopher Makin Trustee 11 March 2024
None on record
Alderman Robert Hughes-Penney Trustee 20 March 2023
None on record
Alastair King Trustee 05 September 2018
None on record
Alderman Alison Gowman CBE Trustee 05 September 2018
None on record
Alderman Alastair King Trustee 05 September 2018
None on record
Alderman Alison Gowman Trustee 05 September 2018
None on record
Fredrik Widlund Trustee 05 September 2018
None on record
Alderman Professor Michael Mainelli Trustee 03 November 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £15.95m £14.95m £15.07m £15.66m £16.70m
Total expenditure £13.35m £15.12m £14.86m £15.19m £15.72m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £233.00k £100.51k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £111.47k £1.70k £49.81k £142.69k £99.53k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £4.31m £4.13m £3.60m £3.13m £3.31m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £11.23m £10.42m £11.10m £12.14m £12.88m
Income - Other £292.53k £401.30k £316.20k £255.78k £418.47k
Income - Legacies £61.82k £0 £39.00k £136.53k £90.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £11.16m £12.90m £12.60m £12.39m £12.76m
Expenditure - Raising funds £2.19m £2.23m £2.27m £2.80m £2.96m
Expenditure - Governance £25.00k £25.17k £27.00k £38.70k £45.29k
Expenditure - Grants institution £127.00k £0 £0 £84.00k £118.01k
Expenditure - Investment management £1.04m £1.09m £1.09m £1.78m £1.94m
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £35.38m £37.96m £36.99m £38.79m £41.73m
Long-term investments £242.32m £267.96m £296.76m £294.94m £257.64m
Other assets £17.49m £15.11m £15.36m £14.58m £64.94m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £33.10m £33.14m £32.65m £33.31m £32.96m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 27 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 30 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 27 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 31 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 22 AUGUST 1986, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 20 JULY 2000.
Charitable objects
1) TO PAY AN ANNUAL STIPEND TO THE CHAPLAIN OF THE CHARITY OF SIR JOHN MORDEN AT BLACKHEATH, IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF GREENWICH 2) FOR OR TOWARDS ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISHES WITHIN THE AREA OF BENEFIT ("AREA OF BENEFIT" MEANS THE AREAS COMPRISING THOSE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISHES IN WHICH LAND AND BUILDINGS FORMING PART OF THE ENDOWMENTS OF THE CHARITY OR OF THE CHARITY OF SIR JOHN MORDEN OF BLACKHEATH IN THE LONDON BOROUGH OF GREENWICH ARE OR HAVE BEEN AT ANY TIME SITUATE AND THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY-THE-VIRGIN, EDWARDSTONE) PROVIDED THAT PREFERENCE SHALL BE GIVEN TO SUCH PURPOSES WITHIN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ALL SAINTS, BLACKHEATH: (A) AUGMENTING THE STIPENDS OF CLERGY OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND WHO ARE SERVING IN SUCH PARISHES; (B) DEFRAYING THE EXPENSES INCURRED BY SUCH CLERGY IN THE PERFORMANCE OF THEIR PAROCHIAL DUTIES; (C) PAYING THE SALARIES OR EXPENSES OF ASSISTANT CLERGY OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND OF CHURCH SERVANTS AND HELPERS IN SUCH PARISHES; (D) THE REPAIR, UPKEEP AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE FABRIC OF PARISH CHURCHES OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN SUCH PARISHES AND THE MAINTENANCE OF SERVICES THEREIN; (E) PROVIDING, REPAIRING, MAINTAINING OR IMPROVING NEW CHURCHES AND CHURCH HALLS AND OTHER BUILDINGS USED OR TO BE USED FOR FURTHERING THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN SUCH PARISHES; (F) PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING FURNITURE AND EQUIPMENT FOR SUCH CHURCHES, CHURCH HALL AND OTHER BUILDINGS; (3) IF AND IN SO FAR AS INCOME IS NOT REQUIRED FOR APPLICATION IN MANNER AFORESAID THE TRUSTEES MAY APPLY THE SAME IN ONE OR BOTH OF THE FOLLOWING WAYS: (A) IN PROVIDING OR ASSISTING IN THE PROVISION OF RESIDENTIAL ACCOMMODATION FOR RETIRED CLERGYMEN OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND THE WIDOWS OF SUCH CLERGYMEN, WHO ARE IN NEED, IN PROPERTY NOT BELONGING TO THE CHARITY AND WHERE DOMESTIC AND NURSING FACILITIES MAY BE AVAILABLE; (B) IN OTHERWISE FURTHERING THE RELIGIOUS AND OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS.
Registration history
  • 11 November 1986 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Morden College
19 St. Germans Place
LONDON
SE3 0PW
Phone:
02084638330