BLIND VETERANS UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We help blind or vision impaired men and women who have served in the UK Armed Forces, and who meet our criteria, by giving the emotional and practical support they require to overcome the challenges they face to discover a life beyond blindness. All blind veterans should have access to the finest quality of services to help them discover life beyond sight loss.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£29,761,000
Donations and legacies | £20.80m | |
Charitable activities | £1.73m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £3.90m | |
Other | £3.34m |
Total expenditure:
£36,292,000
Raising funds | £5.70m | |
Charitable activities | £30.59m | |
Other | £0 |
£3,939,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £5.70m | |
Charitable expenditure | £30.59m |
People

425 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
1048 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 7 |
£70k to £80k | 6 |
£80k to £90k | 3 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£110k to £120k | 2 |
£120k to £130k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 19 November 1962: Standard registration
- ST DUNSTAN'S (Previous name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Ben Caswell | Trustee | 12 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Jarratt | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karl Havard | Trustee | 21 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Hayes | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Jamie Cuthbertson | Trustee | 14 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Sherriff | Trustee | 23 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Alan Holderness | Trustee | 11 December 2018 |
|
|||||
Brigadier Tim Seal TD DL VR | Trustee | 11 December 2018 |
|
|||||
GUY DAVIES | Trustee | 20 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
Neelesh Heredia | Trustee | 26 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Colin Williamson | Trustee | 03 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Barry Coupe | Trustee | 28 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
DAVID TURNER | Trustee | 01 February 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.13m | £27.53m | £28.83m | £37.95m | £29.76m | |
|
Total expenditure | £42.21m | £33.06m | £32.02m | £34.98m | £36.29m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £203.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £17.25m | £20.22m | £18.71m | £16.91m | £20.80m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £8.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.50m | £1.55m | £1.71m | £1.80m | £1.73m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £3.53m | £2.85m | £3.03m | £3.65m | £3.90m | |
|
Income - Other | £4.84m | £2.91m | £5.37m | £15.60m | £3.34m | |
|
Income - Legacies | £10.91m | £11.43m | £11.87m | £10.53m | £14.70m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £31.35m | £26.36m | £26.97m | £29.28m | £30.59m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £7.81m | £6.70m | £5.06m | £5.70m | £5.70m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | £64.00k | £9.13m | £10.34m | £2.15m | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £917.00k | £900.00k | £887.00k | £833.00k | £927.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £3.05m | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £42.12m | £89.80m | £48.19m | £47.57m | £81.10m | |
|
Long-term investments | £83.25m | £41.43m | £87.78m | £83.31m | £62.17m | |
|
Other assets | £8.74m | £11.15m | £9.52m | £13.94m | £18.53m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£13.02m | -£12.17m | -£3.71m | £3.56m | £2.66m | |
|
Total liabilities | £2.48m | £4.99m | £7.62m | £7.80m | £7.56m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 09 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 11 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 30/04/1923 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/07/1935 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 19/06/1940 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/11/1948 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 31/03/1950 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/07/1961 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/11/1963 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/10/1982 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/11/1995 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 27/11/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/12/1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28/11/1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/03/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 06/11/2007 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 27/01/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 SEP 2016 as amended on 22 Mar 2022 as amended on 01 Jun 2022
Charitable objects
4.1 To provide for the medical or surgical treatment, re-education, training in one or more trade or trades, settlement and permanent welfare of:- 4.1.1 Members or former members of the armed forces both men and women blinded from whatever cause whether or not connected in any way with service in the armed forces; 4.1.2 Other persons both men and women not being members or former members of the armed forces who are blinded in or as a consequence of any war or warlike operations in which the forces of the Crown may be at any time engaged or any service connected with or subsidiary to such war or warlike operations or by or as a consequence of enemy action in the course of any such war or warlike operations; and 4.1.3 Other persons both men and women not being members or former members of the UK armed forces who are blinded in or as a consequence of any war or warlike operations or terrorist activity (all such persons being hereinafter referred to as ‘Beneficiaries’) and so that for the purposes of these Articles the word ‘blinded’ shall extend to all cases in which the sight has been so impaired that special care and training are required and all cases in which the sight is endangered so long as the cause of the danger continues. 4.2 To provide allowances or other assistance for any wife, widow, husband, widower, child or dependent of a Beneficiary who may be in need of assistance or any person who shall have kept house for or nursed or otherwise rendered exceptional service to or have been dependent upon a Beneficiary any may after the death of such Beneficiary be in need of assistance.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- ARTHUR PEARSON MEMORIAL FUND
- BED ENDOWMENT FUND
- BLIND SOLDIERS AND SAILORS AFTERCARE COMMITTEE (ALSO KNOWN AS BLINDED SOLDIERS AND SAILORS AFTER-CARE ORGANISATION)
- BLIND SOLDIERS AND SAILORS CARE COMMITTEE (ALSO KNOWN AS BLINDED SOLDIERS AND SAILORS CARE COMMITTEE)
- DARTMOUTH SOLDIERS CLUB CHARITY
- DAVID PATON MCALPINE (NORTHERN IRELAND) TRUST
- DIANA GUBBAY TRUST
- DORIS SCUPHAM BEQUEST
- GENERAL ENDOWMENT FUND
- GEORGE ALBERT DRAKE'S ST DUNSTAN'S CHARITY
- THE HAROLD ADLER SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- TRUST PROPERTY IN CONNECTION WITH PEARSON HOUSE
- 19 November 1962 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
Blind Veterans UK
3 Queen Square
LONDON
WC1N 3AR
- Phone:
- 03001112233
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window