Financial history BEDINGHAM CHARITIES

Charity Number: 217128
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 04/07/2020 04/07/2021 04/07/2022 04/07/2023 04/07/2024
Total gross income £48 £68 £370 £320 £372
Total expenditure £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A