THE USK ALMSHOUSES CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of need
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Monmouthshire
Governance
- 17 July 1967: Standard registration
- USK ALMSHOUSES TRUST (Working name)
- THE USK ALMSHOUSES (Previous name)
- THE USK ALMSHOUSES FUND (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN PATRICIA COWBURN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
David Meirion Howells | Trustee | 01 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sally Louise Ingle-Gillis | Trustee | 31 March 2021 |
|
|||||
TRACEY HUXLEY | Trustee | 21 October 2011 |
|
|||||
RICHARD BARRY MORSE | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR TONY WATKINS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.89k | £5.89k | £5.90k | £6.43k | £8.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.78k | £6.27k | £5.00k | £7.65k | £8.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 November 2022 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 29 NOVEMBER 1972
Charitable objects
IN RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE URBAN DISTRICT OF USK WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
USK
Linked charities
- 17 July 1967 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 Chepstow Road
USK
NP15 1BL
- Phone:
- 01291673233
- Email:
- morse.usk@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window