Financial history SHREWSBURY SECULAR CLERGY FUND

Charity Number: 218087
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £48.29k £28.12k £51.48k £66.91k £34.95k
Total expenditure £53.75k £59.70k £72.44k £65.21k £63.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A