HOLME LACY PAROCHIAL CHARITIES

Charity number: 218903
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity supports those in the ancient parish of Holme Lacy in various needs, such as illness, disability, education of the young and groups or organisations who also assist the above.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £23,356
Total expenditure: £24,507

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Herefordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 December 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • PRYNCE'S HOLME LACY CHARITY (Working name)
  • PAROCHIAL CHARITIES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Mark Johnson Chair 26 June 2023
LUTWYCHE CHURCHYARD TRUST
Received: On time
F R SYMONS
Received: On time
HONOURABLE JANE SCUDAMORE CHARITY
Received: On time
THE CHARITY OF HENRY PEARLE
Received: On time
JOSEPH COOKE
Received: On time
REV ROLAND MUCKLESTON
Charity reporting is overdue by 181 days
Guy Jonathan Hewett Trustee 08 November 2024
HONOURABLE JANE SCUDAMORE CHARITY
Received: On time
Christina Eve Harris Trustee 08 November 2024
HONOURABLE JANE SCUDAMORE CHARITY
Received: On time
Ashok Kikabhai Bavabhai Trustee 08 November 2024
HONOURABLE JANE SCUDAMORE CHARITY
Received: On time
Nicholas Austin Trustee 15 April 2014
HONOURABLE JANE SCUDAMORE CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £19.97k £20.16k £20.53k £22.41k £23.36k
Total expenditure £17.36k £16.70k £19.20k £29.35k £24.51k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 09 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 17 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 09 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 3 JANUARY 1908 AS VARIED BY SCHEME OF 8 FEBRUARY 1955
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF POOR
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF HOLME LACY
Registration history
  • 12 December 1963 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
7A River View Close
Holme Lacy
HEREFORD
HR2 6NZ
Phone:
07958 984508