JUDSON'S HOMES FOR OLD MEN AND WOMEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
In 1914 the charity's founder Charles William Judson left a legacy in his will for the building of six almshouses in Ripon. The occupation is restricted to persons over 70 years with limited means. Residents must have lived within 5 miles of the City of Ripon for the ten years prior to appointment. The charity's aims are to maintain and improve the almshouses for the benefit of the residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 29 May 1964: Standard registration
- JUDSONS HOMES (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jacqueline Mary Roberts | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||||
Allan Tunningley | Trustee | 19 April 2021 |
|
|
||||||
Stuart Andrew Martin MBE | Trustee | 07 December 2009 |
|
|||||||
PAUL GRAHAM FREEMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £16.24k | £15.00k | £18.04k | £28.73k | £30.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.36k | £5.03k | £30.12k | £55.87k | £6.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 November 2024 | 21 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 December 2024 | 35 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 May 2024 | 189 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 June 2023 | 231 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 05 February 2021 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 12TH APRIL 1911
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE ALMHOUSES FOR OLD MEN AND WOMEN, NOT UNDER 70 YEARS OF AGE, MARRIED OR SINGLE PREFERENCE BEING GIVEN TO PEOPLE WHO HAVE RESIDED IN OR WITHIN 5 MILES OF RIPON FOR AT LEAST TEN YEARS PREVIOUSLY.
Area of benefit
RIPON
Contact information
- Address:
-
77 NORTH STREET
RIPON
NORTH YORKSHIRE
HG4 1DP
- Phone:
- 01765602156
- Email:
- amh@hb-law.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window