Financial history The Physiotherapy Benevolent Fund

Charity number: 219568
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £176.83k £119.65k £216.38k £108.71k £141.70k
Total expenditure £88.72k £83.30k £99.54k £79.20k £62.79k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A