EPWORTH CHARITIES

Charity number: 219744
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Trustees of Epworth Charities have small amounts of money available to help individuals who live within the parish boundary of Epworth, North Lincolnshire, who have a special need.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024

Total income: £4,855
Total expenditure: £4,339

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
Where the charity operates:
  • Lincolnshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 13 November 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Paul David Wilson Chair 25 September 2019
CHURCH ESTATE
Received: On time
TRAVIS'S EDUCATIONAL FOUNDATION
Received: On time
BELTON COMMUNITY AID
Received: On time
Gary Cunliffe Baker Trustee 13 July 2023
None on record
Jonathan Robert Whittaker Trustee 25 September 2019
None on record
SUSAN STOREY Trustee 26 September 2017
CHURCH ESTATE
Received: On time
Ellie Wilson Trustee 22 September 2015
None on record
Dr John Lambert Trustee 13 March 1997
ISLE CHORAL SINGERS
Received: On time
EPWORTH OLD RECTORY (OPERATIONS)
Received: On time
EPWORTH & ISLE OF AXHOLME ROTARY CLUB TRUST FUND
Received: On time
Epworth Scunthorpe and Gainsborough Methodist Circuit
Received: 102 days late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £4.06k £3.58k £3.73k £3.77k £4.86k
Total expenditure £1.32k £5.86k £3.27k £2.48k £4.34k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 April 2024 27 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2023 07 August 2024 160 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2022 22 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2021 15 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 30 April 2020 08 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Contact information

Address:
16 Belton Road
Epworth
DONCASTER
South Yorkshire
DN9 1JL
Phone:
01427872528
Website:

No information available