LOUISA COTTAGES CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity manages the Almshouses at Tring, and applies income for repairs and for the benefit of the Almspeople
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

2 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Hertfordshire
Governance
- 03 July 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
The Honourable Emily Freeman-Attwood | Trustee | 18 June 2015 |
|
|||
S.J.P. TRUST CORPORATION LIMITED | Trustee | 22 May 2014 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.95k | £49.68k | £55.01k | £56.31k | £57.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.52k | £21.18k | £26.93k | £40.40k | £38.43k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 21 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 03 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 23 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 30 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 01 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL OF EMMA LOUISA, LADY ROTHSCHILD PROVED WITH CODICIL AT PPR ON THE 3RD JULY 1935 AND SCHEME OF THE 23RD NOVEMBER 1964
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES OF AGED OR INFIRM POOR PERSONS WHO AT THE TIME OF ELECTION SHALL BE OR SHALL PREVIOUSLY HAVE BEEN EMPLOYEES (INCLUDING DOMESTIC SERVANTS) ON THE TRING PARK ESTATE OR SHALL BE AT THE TIME OF ELECTION INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF TRING.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF TRING
Contact information
- Address:
-
c/o J Rothschild Services Ltd
Estate Office
Queen Street
Waddesdon
Aylesbury
HP18 0JW
- Phone:
- 01296653410
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window