HULL TRINITY HOUSE CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide financial grants and accommodation in Alms Houses. Maintain and rent out properties to provide the income to help beneficiaries
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 September 2023
Total income:
£1,870,149
Donations and legacies | £278.91k | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £1.25m | |
Investments | £341.32k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£1,679,455
Raising funds | £712.84k | |
Charitable activities | £407.41k | |
Other | £559.21k |
£709,831 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £255,218 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.27m | |
Charitable expenditure | £407.41k | |
Retained for future use | £190.69k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.27m | |
Charitable expenditure | £407.41k | |
Retained for future use | £900.53k |
People

38 Employee(s)
13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 10 July 2002: Standard registration
- 30 November 2005: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CAPTAIN MICHAEL EDWIN KELLY | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
CAPTAIN GEORGE JAMES RAWDING | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
CAPTAIN CHRISTOPHER CHARLES WITHERS TOWNE | Trustee | 27 August 2021 |
|
|||||||||||
CAPTAIN CHRISTOPHER STUART ADAMS | Trustee | 18 December 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
CAPTAIN PHILIP JOHN COWING | Trustee | 23 May 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
CAPTAIN JOHN TINDALL | Trustee | 23 May 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
Captain Raymond John Hancock | Trustee | 14 July 2017 |
|
|||||||||||
CAPTAIN DAVID MALCOLM SHAW | Trustee | 29 October 2012 |
|
|||||||||||
CAPTAIN DAVID HENRY ATKIN | Trustee | 12 April 2012 |
|
|||||||||||
CAPTAIN JOHN DENNIS COGGIN | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
CAPTAIN STUART LEONARD GAMBLE | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
CAPTAIN JOHN DENNIS ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
CAPT PHILIP ARTHUR WATTS | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 04/09/2019 | 02/09/2020 | 01/09/2021 | 07/09/2022 | 06/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.71m | £1.43m | £1.68m | £2.40m | £1.87m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.67m | £1.39m | £1.52m | £1.75m | £1.68m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £59.22k | £435.66k | £255.22k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £138 | £18.53k | £59.27k | £436.04k | £278.91k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £1.41m | £1.15m | £1.33m | £1.63m | £1.25m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £300.75k | £264.33k | £291.19k | £285.62k | £341.32k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £50.00k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £5.04k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £511.54k | £396.23k | £388.79k | £438.51k | £407.41k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £620.32k | £564.53k | £673.83k | £733.18k | £712.84k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £12.94k | £13.14k | £13.50k | £14.03k | £13.44k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £500 | £500 | £500 | £500 | £500 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £35.64k | £38.35k | £35.10k | £33.23k | £33.99k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £533.85k | £428.01k | £455.57k | £573.70k | £559.21k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 04/09/2019 | 02/09/2020 | 01/09/2021 | 07/09/2022 | 06/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £8.61m | £8.40m | £8.76m | £3.95m | £4.22m | |
|
Long-term investments | £27.89m | £24.85m | £25.52m | £29.07m | £30.41m | |
|
Other assets | £758.89k | £541.92k | £994.35k | £6.22m | £5.46m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £181.87k | £196.33k | £143.74k | £163.12k | £102.66k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 September 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 September 2023 | 01 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 07 September 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 07 September 2022 | 30 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 01 September 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 01 September 2021 | 20 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 02 September 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 02 September 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 04 September 2019 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 04 September 2019 | 17 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSION DATED 7 OCTOBER 2005 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 4 NOVEMBER 2010
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT: (1) THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. (A) THE TRUSTEES MAY RELIEVE SUCH PERSONS IN NEED BY: (I) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO THEM; OR (II) PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THEM; OR (III) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO OTHER PERSONS OR BODIES WHO PROVIDE GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO THOSE IN NEED; OR (IV) IN SUCH OTHER WAYS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT. (2) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR SUCH PERSONS. (3) IN SELECTING BENEFICIARIES UNDER SUB CLAUSE (1) AND (2) ABOVE, THE TRUSTEES MUST GIVE PREFERENCE: (A) FIRSTLY TO BRETHREN, SEAFARERS, THEIR SPOUSES AND DEPENDANTS AND SPOUSES AND DEPENDANTS OF DECEASED SEAFARERS; AND (B) SECONDLY TO OTHER PERSONS WHO ARE OVER 60 YEARS OF AGE. (4) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF RESIDENTS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE. (5) TO FURTHER THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY KNOWN AS THE HULL TRINITY HOUSE SCHOOL. (6) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR YOUNG PERSONS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR TRAINING, RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE-TIME ACTIVITY IN SAILING AND OTHER WATER SPORTS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- CAPTAIN NORTH MEMORIAL PRIZE
- CAPTAIN STOTT'S PRIZE FOR THE CADET SHOWING THE GREATEST IMPROVEMENT OVER THE YEAR
- CULLINGTON PRIZE FOR SELF EXPRESSION
- HILYARD PRIZE FOR COMPUTER STUDIES
- HULL TRINITY HOUSE SCHOOL CHARITY
- HULL TRINITY HOUSE SCHOOL PRIZE FUND
- JOHN F CUDBERTSON MEMORIAL PRIZE FOR CONSISTENT EFFORT IN NAUTICAL MAIN SUBJECTS
- MRS J G JONES PRIZE FUND
- PETER BARMBY PRIZE FOR GENERAL PURPOSES
- THE HOSPITAL OF THE FOUNDATION OF BISHOP WATSON
- WILLIAM ABBOT PRIZE
- 10 July 2002 : Standard registration
- 30 November 2005 : Removed
Contact information
- Address:
-
HULL TRINITY HOUSE CHARITY
TRINITY HOUSE
TRINITY HOUSE LANE
HULL
HU1 2JG
- Phone:
- 01482324956
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window