GLOSSOP AND DISTRICT AGE CONCERN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provide advice and information/sign posting for elderly people. Run Social afternoon under name of "Seniors Club" once monthly. Run, in conjuction with WRVS, a twice monthly Luncheon Club. Various Outings. Distribute Harvest Parcels Distribute Christmas Parcels. Palm Sunday and Christmas Parties. Send Birthday and Christmas cards to all Clients registered.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 24 April 1964: Standard registration
- 09 September 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 15 November 2011: Re-registered
- BOROUGH OF GLOSSOP OLD PEOPLE'S WELFARE COMMITTEE (Previous name)
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOYCE BROCKLEHURST | Chair |
|
|
|||||
GLOSSOP & DISTRICT AGE CONCERN | Trustee | 06 December 2011 |
|
|||||
OLIVE MACKAY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.64k | £1.18k | £4.48k | £17.42k | £3.26k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.64k | £3.11k | £4.03k | £6.37k | £6.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 07 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 December 2024 | 323 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 11 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 03 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED JUNE 1951 AS AMENDED ON 6 JUNE 1974
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE AND ASSIST THE GENERAL GOOD OF ALL ELDERLY PEOPLE IN THE FORMER BOROUGH OF GLOSSOP AND SUCH PARTS OF THE SURROUNDING DISTRICT AS THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE. TO ASSIST ANY OTHER CHARITABLE BODY OR BODIES FINANCIALLY OR OTHERWISE TO DO LIKEWISE.
Area of benefit
FORMER BOROUGH OF GLOSSOP
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 SPINNEY CLOSE
GLOSSOP
SK13 7BR
- Phone:
- 01457862743
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window