Financial history THE LEONARD LAITY STOATE CHARITY

Charity number: 221325
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £90.81k £72.24k £47.86k £54.49k £54.17k
Total expenditure £87.93k £84.17k £79.19k £83.04k £80.74k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A