ARCHBISHOP HOLGATE'S HOSPITAL IN HEMSWORTH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity exists to maintain the hospital which consists of 24 almshouses, a chapel and ancillary buildings. Qualifying persons over 60 entitled to reside here are elected from local parishes. The education foundation provides financial assistance towards the education of persons under 25 years also resident in local parishes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of Wakefield
Governance
- 26 September 1963: Standard registration
- ARCHBISHOP HOLGATE'S HOSPITAL (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DAVID CHARLES THEAKER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Neil Smith | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peta Jane Greaves | Trustee | 05 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Dominic Peter Stewart Mackenzie | Trustee | 03 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Janet Davies | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Scholey | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT WILLIS HYDE | Trustee | 21 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
REVEREND ROBERT WILLIAM HART | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN DAVID MALCOLM SKIRROW | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR JEFF COOKE | Trustee |
|
||||||
MR TONY BLAZA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £499.22k | £497.62k | £480.28k | £511.15k | £441.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £376.64k | £325.61k | £552.44k | £453.55k | £548.80k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £11.29k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £499.86k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £414.37k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £39.18k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £38.05k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £99.37k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £30.98k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 19 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 21 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
A SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 16 NOVEMBER 2005. AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 01 NOV 2017
Charitable objects
(1) THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE: (A) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR BENEFICIARIES; AND (B) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE. (C) TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND ARE RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT(2) THE LAND IDENTIFIED IN PART 1 OF THE SCHEDULE TO THIS SCHEME MUST BE RETAINED BY THE TRUSTEES FOR USE FOR THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY.
Area of benefit
HEMSWORTH, FELKIRK, SOUTH KIRKBY, WRAGBY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Office
Robin Lane
Hemsworth
West Yorkshire
WF9 4PW
- Phone:
- 01977619797
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window