THE LINEN AND WOOLLEN STOCK CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The main objectives of the Charity are the relief of persons resident in the area of benefit who are in need, hardship or distress and assisting those not for profit organisations in the community supporting the well being of the residents.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

13 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Wigan
Governance
- 17 April 1969: Standard registration
- ASHTON-IN-MAKERFIELD LINEN & WOOLLEN STOCK CHARITY (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
13 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANDREW JOHN BULLEN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
David Marsh | Trustee | 13 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sandra Jones | Trustee | 22 May 2024 |
|
|||||
Joanna Murphy | Trustee | 21 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Beth Hughes | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amy Elizabeth Napier | Trustee | 31 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joanne Maher | Trustee | 16 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ben Gosling | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Renee Palmer | Trustee | 19 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Christine Moorfield | Trustee | 31 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
PAULA GILLESPIE | Trustee | 12 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANN DUCKWORTH | Trustee | 13 July 2011 |
|
|
||||
MR BILL MORRIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.70k | £11.01k | £8.93k | £9.81k | £11.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.40k | £11.57k | £8.62k | £10.68k | £12.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 27 February 2024 | 27 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 20 JANUARY 1966, AS AMENDED BY ORDER DATED 23 SEPTEMBER 2004. as amended on 01 Oct 2024 as amended on 24 Mar 2025
Charitable objects
General Benefit of the poor (1) The object of the charity is the relief of persons resident in the area of benefit who are in need, hardship or distress and assisting those 'not for profit organisations' in the community who support the residents. (2) The trustees may relieve persons in need by: (a) making grants of money to them; or (b) providing or paying for goods, services or facilities for them; or (c) making grants of money to other persons or bodies who provide goods, services or facilities to those in need. (3) In exceptional cases the trustees may decide to assist someone (who is otherwise qualified) who is: (a) resident outside the area of benefit; or (b) only temporarily resident in the area of benefit (4) In helping 'not for profit' community organisations the charity will provide funds as one off payments to such to help them maintain or establish local bodies for the benefit of the people in the Ashton charity area.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT TOWNSHIP OF ASHTON IN MAKERFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
41 Kiveton Drive
Ashton-In-Makerfield
WIGAN
Lancashire
WN4 9EX
- Phone:
- 07846302924
- Email:
- linen.charity@aol.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window