Skip to main content
CHARITY COMMISSION
FOR ENGLAND AND WALES
Register of Charities
englishcymraeg
Log in to online services
  1. Home
Search

Linked charities THE SHAFTESBURY SOCIETY

Charity Number: 221948
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Skip to Content
  • Charity overview
  • What, who, how, where
  • Governance
  • Trustees
  • Financial history
  • Accounts and annual returns
  • Governing document
  • Linked charities
  • Contact information
Linked charities
  • BARCLAY'S HORSLEYDOWN MISSION CHARITY
  • CHISWICK MISSION
  • CONEY HILL SCHOOL WILL TRUSTS
  • ELEANOR GELDERD
  • GEORGE FREDERICK FROOMS
  • HIGHWAY EVANGELICAL CHURCH
  • JANE BALD MAXTON
  • JOHN KIRK CRIPPLES HOME FUND
  • JOSIAH FOSTER COT
  • KING EDWARD INSTITUTION ENDOWMENT FUND
  • LILIAN JANE CLARKE FOR GIFFORD HALL
  • MARGARET SHORT COLES
  • MARMADUKE LEVITT'S GIFT
  • MARSH STREET MISSION
  • MR AND MRS ARTHUR BENTALL
  • SAMUEL HALE BIBBY ENDOWMENT FUND
  • SHOEBLACK SOCIETY FUND
  • THE BEDDINGTON FUND
  • THE PLATT MISSION
  • THE SHAFTESBURY WELCOME MISSION
  • WILLIAM FREDERICK URRY
Linked charity 221948-1 BARCLAY'S HORSLEYDOWN MISSION CHARITY
Governing document
INDENTURE DATED 16 OCTOBER 1890 SCHEMES OF 20 JUNE 1941 AND 15 MAY 1973
Charitable objects
FOR PROMOTING RELIGION AS HELD AND TAUGHT BY EVANGELICAL PROTESTANT CHURCHES, ENCOURAGING TEMPERANCE AND THRIFTS AND OF RELIEVING NECESSITOUS PERSONS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 15 April 1969 : Standard registration
  • 15 May 2000 : Removed

Print charity details Loading
Save and Close

Tell us whether you accept cookies

We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.

We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.

Accept all cookies Set cookie preferences
Was this page useful?

Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window

Charity Commission's privacy notice – how we use your personal information

  • Cookies
  • Accessibility
All content is available under the Open Government Licence v3.0 , except where otherwise stated
© Crown copyright