MELTON MOWBRAY TOWN ESTATE

Charity number: 222142
Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Parks and leisure.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2023

Total income: £497,327
Total expenditure: £652,885

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Leicestershire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 August 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • MELTON MOWDRAY TOWN ESTATE (Previous name)
  • TOWN ESTATE (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
GRAHAM BETT Chair 07 October 2013
None on record
Dr DAVID MICHAEL STEVENS Trustee 02 October 2023
None on record
Alison D'Angelo Trustee 03 October 2022
None on record
Christopher Gray Trustee 03 October 2022
THE NOTTINGHAM AND DISTRICT SOCIETY OF ORGANISTS
Received: On time
Hilary Misiuda Trustee 03 October 2022
None on record
Eric Tindall Trustee 03 October 2022
None on record
KEITH HALLAM Trustee 02 October 2017
MELTON MOWBRAY BUILDING SOCIETY CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
ADRIENNE HOLLAND Trustee 02 October 2016
None on record
IAN ANTHONY NEALE Trustee 07 March 2013
None on record
RICHARD SAGE Trustee
None on record
PETER ALBERT ROFFEY OBE DL Trustee
MELTON MOWBRAY PARISH CHURCH RESTORATION APPEAL FUND
Received: On time
MR TIM WEBSTER Trustee
Hudson's and Storer's Charities
Received: On time
DEREK FREDRICK WHITEHOUSE MBE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2019 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023
Total gross income £502.34k £571.42k £531.09k £514.68k £497.33k
Total expenditure £623.27k £612.73k £670.98k £599.53k £652.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A £195.04k £75.45k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £3.07k £0 £195.54k £76.47k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £162.96k £161.29k £85.47k £129.30k N/A
Income - Charitable activities £132.30k £117.53k £102.15k £148.87k N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £197.16k £142.60k £143.80k £133.13k N/A
Income - Other £6.85k £150.00k £4.13k £26.91k N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £431.33k £411.46k £441.77k £383.17k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £191.94k £201.27k £229.21k £216.36k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £19.30k £25.46k £22.21k £30.64k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £324 £9.94k £9.52k £8.50k N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 24 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 24 November 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 23 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 23 December 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
TOWN BAILIFFS COTTAGE
2 PARK LANE
MELTON MOWBRAY
LEICESTERSHIRE
LE13 0PT
Phone:
01664564559
Website:

meltonmowbraytownestate.co.uk