Financial history TWYCROSS AND PERKINS CHARITY

Charity Number: 222435
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £385 £292 £473 £577 £644
Total expenditure £500 £520 £0 £300 £450
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A