ABBEYFIELD NORTHUMBRIA

Charity Number: 222742
Charity reporting is up to date (1 day late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The principal activity of the Society is to provide accommodation, care and companionship for lonely or frail elderly people in accordance with the aims and principles of The Abbeyfield Society Limited.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

One or more trustees receive payments or benefits from the charity for providing services to the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Newcastle Upon Tyne City
  • Northumberland

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 October 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • THE ABBEYFIELD NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE SOCIETY LIMITED (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Care Quality Commission
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

9 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
BRIAN DUELL Trustee 25 October 2023
ST AIDAN'S COMMUNITY CENTRE ORGANISATION
Received: On time
ST AIDAN'S COMMUNITY CENTRE CIO
Recently registered
ELIZABETH MARJORIE ANNE HARDIE Trustee 25 October 2023
THE ABBEYFIELD BERWICK SOCIETY LIMITED
Charity reporting is overdue by 294 days
CAROLE LESLEY EKE JP, BEd Trustee 25 October 2023
THE NEWCASTLE CENTRAL AND EAST CIRCUIT OF THE METHODIST CHURCH
Received: On time
TRINITY CHURCH GOSFORTH
Received: On time
John Crawford Woodman Trustee 25 October 2023
BAMBURGH HERITAGE TRUST
Received: On time
THE COAST CARE TRUST
Received: On time
James Alexander Thompson Trustee 25 October 2023
None on record
VERA ROSE WILKINSON Trustee 25 October 2023
None on record
ANTHONY WILLIAM KAY Trustee 25 October 2023
None on record
Bryan John Ellis Trustee 25 October 2023
None on record
Ralph Robert Baker-Cresswell Trustee 25 October 2023
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £1.96m £2.01m £2.03m £2.21m £4.44m
Total expenditure £1.85m £1.98m £2.02m £2.32m £2.82m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £122.57k £81.85k £28.90k N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £5.74k £3.48k £2.79k £4.89k £191.38k
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 £985
Income - Charitable activities £1.87m £1.96m £1.97m £2.14m £4.07m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £48.41k £35.61k £43.60k £56.96k £85.99k
Income - Other £38.79k £16.96k £15.23k £15.21k £86.41k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 £188.76k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.84m £1.96m £2.00m £2.30m £2.80m
Expenditure - Raising funds £18.29k £18.64k £21.29k £21.58k £22.54k
Expenditure - Governance £6.54k £6.54k £6.54k £7.74k £143.22k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £18.29k £18.64k £21.29k £21.58k £22.10k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Own use assets £1.75m £1.67m £1.60m £1.56m £2.56m
Long-term investments £2.61m £2.41m £2.88m £2.72m £3.56m
Other assets £651.26k £1.14m £875.49k £871.25k £903.21k
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £432.55k £454.20k £472.95k £453.20k £703.89k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 01 December 2024 1 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 01 December 2024 1 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2023 24 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 24 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 15 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 15 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2021 13 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 13 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2020 10 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 10 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 23 MAY 1978 VARIED BY SCHEME OF 16 MARCH 1982
Charitable objects
SEBJECT TO THE PAYMENT OF MANAGEMENT EXPENSES THE INCOME SHALL BE APPLIED TO THE PROVISION OF HOMES FOR POOR, ELDERLY OR INFIRM PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE BENEFICIAL AREAS WITH A PREFERENCE FOR PERSONS SO QUALIFIED WHO ARE INVALID OR RECOVERING FROM SICKNESS.
Area of benefit
NORTHLAND, DURHAM, TYNE AND WEAR AS CONSTITUTED 31 MARCH 197
Registration history
  • 25 October 1963 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Abbeyfield Northumbria
Head Office
40A The Grove
Gosforth
NEWCASTLE UPON TYNE
NE3 1NH
Phone:
01912857174