PROVINCIAL/WALSH TRUST FOR BOLTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The trust was set up with the purpose of providing modest financial assistance to individuals or groups living or working within the Bolton Metropolitan area to achieve personal goals or small projects, particularly those helping others. It does not provide for personal loans, commercial enterprises or large building projects.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 26 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Bolton
Governance
- 03 February 1964: Standard registration
- 26 October 2011: Funds received from 526076 DAVID WALSH
- PROVINCIAL INSURANCE COMPANY TRUST FOR BOLTON (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Carol Anne Corbett | Chair | 23 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Christine Ellis | Trustee | 28 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
Robert Binks | Trustee | 19 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
BRIAN BROUGHTON | Trustee | 19 August 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID STEELE PORTER | Trustee |
|
||||||
PETER STEELE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 26/10/2019 | 26/10/2020 | 26/10/2021 | 26/10/2022 | 26/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £37.92k | £31.78k | £30.86k | £32.78k | £40.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £54.15k | £43.07k | £48.62k | £40.63k | £33.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 26 October 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 October 2023 | 04 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 October 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 October 2022 | 06 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 October 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 October 2021 | 27 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 October 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 October 2020 | 14 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 26 October 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 26 October 2019 | 26 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 26/10/2011 as amended on 18 Feb 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF PERSONS UNDER THE AGE OF 25 WHO ARE INHABITANTS OF HARWOOD IN BOLTON.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
13 Elm Grove
Bromley Cross
BOLTON
BL7 9LE
- Phone:
- 01204 540900
- Email:
- Info@fieldingsporter.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window