Financial history HIGHBURY THEATRE CENTRE LIMITED

Charity number: 223923
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £93.70k £61.35k £93.95k £227.85k £117.45k
Total expenditure £100.24k £70.73k £109.08k £117.21k £125.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £12.00k £19.94k N/A N/A £2.23k