Financial history THE QUEEN VICTORIA AND JOHNSON MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity number: 224263
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 25/07/2020 25/07/2021 25/07/2022 25/07/2023 25/07/2024
Total gross income £13.31k £12.96k £13.47k £13.37k £13.54k
Total expenditure £9.54k £15.67k £12.76k £25.55k £15.52k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A