LANCASHIRE COUNTY NURSING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objects of the charity is to benefit sick needy persons resident within Lancs, Gr. Manchr, S. Cumbria, Liverpl and Sefton with up to 20% of the net yearly income being available for the benefit of retired district nursing staff who have worked in the same area. There is no restriction on the overall amount to benefit the sick needy. Application of amounts is at the discretion of the trustees.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Blackburn With Darwen
- Blackpool
- Bolton
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Stockport
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 14 February 1964: Standard registration
- 11 March 2013: Funds received from 222237 BLACKBURN DOMICILIARY NURSES' AMENITY FUND
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN TIMOTHY WAINWRIGHT | Chair | 22 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mary Susanne Kime | Trustee | 20 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Graham Carter Curwen | Trustee | 22 June 2021 |
|
|||||
Karen Joy Yates | Trustee | 24 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Atkins | Trustee | 20 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
JANICE SCANLON | Trustee | 18 June 2013 |
|
|||||
HADYN JAMES GIGG MBE | Trustee |
|
||||||
JANET CROSS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.68k | £15.53k | £15.77k | £16.23k | £16.39k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.51k | £18.95k | £12.87k | £15.82k | £11.32k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 18 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 27 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 02 NOV 1954 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 24 OCT 1977 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 08 NOV 2007 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 28 NOV 2019
Charitable objects
1. THE TRUSTEES MAY APPLY NOT MORE THAN ONE-FIFTH OF YEARLY INCOME FOR THE BENEFIT OF RETIRED NURSES, WHO HAVE BEEN EMPLOYED BY THE LANCASHIRE COUNTY NURSING ASSOCIATION. 2. SUBJECT TO ABOVE PAYMENTS THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE CLEAR YEARLY INCOME FOR THE BENEFIT OF SICK NEEDY PERSONS AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
LIVERPOOL AND SEFTON IN MERSEYSIDE AND THE AREAS OF LANCASHIRE, GREATER MANCHESTER AND SOUTH CUMBRIA, (INCLUDING THE COUTNY BOROUGHS AND UNITARY AUTHORITIES)
Contact information
- Address:
-
Plumpton House
Great Plumpton
Preston
PR4 3NE
- Phone:
- 01772673618
- Email:
- hadyngigg@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window