Financial history SIR GEORGE FRANKLIN'S PENSION CHARITY

Charity number: 224883
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 25/07/2020 25/07/2021 25/07/2022 25/07/2023 25/07/2024
Total gross income £9.41k £9.10k £9.51k £9.37k £9.63k
Total expenditure £6.92k £6.47k £9.17k £23.41k £16.35k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A