THE HART MEMORIAL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of living accommodation and the upkeep of property at Harts Close Hornsea to the aged members of the public who have resided within the boundary of Kingston Upon Hull and East Riding of Yorkshire
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- East Riding Of Yorkshire
Governance
- 30 September 1963: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN BRIGHAM WARD | Chair |
|
|
|||||||||||
Leonard Stephen Deas | Trustee | 25 March 2019 |
|
|||||||||||
ANN MERRITT | Trustee | 15 October 2011 |
|
|
||||||||||
NORMAN HAROLD BROXHAM | Trustee |
|
||||||||||||
SARAH LAWRENCE EGGLESTON JP | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.15k | £63.74k | £66.33k | £65.15k | £82.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.05k | £72.19k | £54.79k | £51.98k | £91.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 07 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2019
(These accounts |
17 April 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME ESTABLISHED BY THE HIGH COURT OF JUSTICE ON 10 MARCH 1952, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 21 NOVEMBER 2006 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 09 MAY 2017
Charitable objects
1. THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, THE RELIEF OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AMONGST BENEFICIARIES IN SUCH NEED BY THE PROVISION OF ALMSHOUSE ACCOMMODATION FOR THEM. 2. THE TRUSTEES MAY, IN EXCEPTIONAL CIRCUMSTANCES, APPOINT A RESIDENT WHO LIVES OUTSIDE THE AREA OF BENEFIT AND HAS NOT RESIDED, WORKED OR CARRIED ON BUSINESS IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT FOR AT LEAST FIVE YEARS BUT IS OTHERWISE QUALIFIED.
Area of benefit
KINGSTON UPON HULL DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
Rollits Llp
Citadel House
58 High Street
Hull
HU1 1QE
- Phone:
- 08454638194
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window