Financial history THE HOBHOUSE CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 225875
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £10.60k £6.91k £15.35k £14.20k £17.94k
Total expenditure £10.50k £8.75k £15.00k £15.00k £18.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A