THE MARINE BIOLOGICAL ASSOCIATION OF THE UNITED KINGDOM

Charity number: 226063
Removed charity

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To promote the investigation and to disseminate knowledge of the seas and marine life, including the use of marine and other organisms for basic biosciences (marine biology in its widest sense) for the benefit of the public.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015

Total income: £0
Total expenditure: £15,371,993

Fundraising

This charity does not raise funds from the public

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Devon
  • Plymouth City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 11 September 1969: Standard registration
  • 19 January 2016: Removed (Transfer of funds)
  • 19 January 2016: Funds transferred to 1155893 THE MARINE BIOLOGICAL ASSOCIATION OF THE UNITED KI...
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2010 31/03/2012 31/03/2013 31/03/2014 31/03/2015
Total gross income £4.69m £5.54m £6.38m £3.73m £0
Total expenditure £4.19m £5.69m £4.47m £4.57m £15.37m
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.13m £1.33m £2.89m £541.43k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £83.71k £207.11k £179.33k £160.35k N/A
Income - Charitable activities £2.97m £3.64m £2.99m £2.65m N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £506.39k £356.25k £329.85k £375.11k N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £2.22m £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £3.93m £5.46m £4.20m £4.30m N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Expenditure - Governance £138.91k £79.96k £86.99k £83.58k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £56.82k £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2015 06 January 2016 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2015 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2014 30 January 2015 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2014 30 January 2015 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2013 23 December 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2013 23 December 2013 On Time
Annual return 31 March 2012 03 December 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2012 03 December 2012 On Time

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED AT THE PRINCIPAL REGISTRY ON 25 MARCH 1938
Charitable objects
TO BE APPLIED TOWARDS THE COST OF PUBLISHING BOOKS OR HANDBOOKS ON THE MARINE FAUNA OF THE BRITISH ISLES. THE PURCHASE OF SPECIAL APPARATUS FOR THE WORK OF RESEARCH STUDENTS IN THE LABORATORY OF THE MARINE BIOLOGICAL ASSOCIATION. THE PURCHASE OF BOOKS CONNECTED WITH OR RELATED TO THE OBJECTS OF THE ASSOCIATION FOR THE LIBRARY, OTHER THAN TEXT BOOKS AND SERIAL JOURNALS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Registration history
  • 11 September 1969 : Standard registration
  • 19 January 2016 : Removed
  • 19 January 2016 : Asset transfer out