CRAY VALLEY WAR MEMORIAL HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision and maintenance of the Village Hall and annexe for use by the inhabitants of St Mary Cray and the neighbourhood. Without distinction of political, religious or other opinions, including use for meetings, lectures and classes, and for other forms of recreation and leisure time occupation, with the object of improving life for the said.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bromley
- Kent
Governance
- 17 October 1963: Standard registration
- ST MARY CRAY VILLAGE HALL (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Phillipa Bild | Chair | 12 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
James Maurice Newby | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher John Price | Trustee | 11 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Sheila Vivien Anderson | Trustee | 18 March 2019 |
|
|||||
JAMES MICHAEL COOK | Trustee | 20 November 2017 |
|
|||||
Harry Stranger | Trustee | 19 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Jasmine Mary Bear | Trustee | 19 September 2017 |
|
|
||||
James Bryce | Trustee | 06 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE GILES | Trustee | 21 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
DAVID JOHN HOUSE | Trustee | 21 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £44.92k | £49.53k | £36.74k | £39.92k | £49.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £45.97k | £16.30k | £13.55k | £25.09k | £60.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.87k | £433 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 03 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 10TH JUNE 1980
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A VILLAGE HALL FOR THE USE OF THE INHABITANTS OF ST. MARY CRAY AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF WITHOU DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPIONIONS, INCLUDING USE FOR MEETINGS, LECTURES AND CLASSES, AND FOR OTHER FORMS OF RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
ST. MARY CRAY AND NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
120 Perry Hall Road
Orpington
BR6 0EF
- Phone:
- 01689839031
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window