SEAFARERS UK (KING GEORGE'S FUND FOR SAILORS)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Seafarers UK is a charity that helps people in the maritime community, by providing vital funding to support seafarers in need and their families and to those in education or training who are preparing to work or serve at Sea. We do this by giving money to organisations and projects that make a real difference to people's lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£2,767,000
Donations and legacies | £2.00m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £156.00k | |
Investments | £610.00k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£4,299,000
Raising funds | £1.25m | |
Charitable activities | £3.05m | |
Other | £0 |
£1,534,000 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.25m | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.05m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.25m | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.05m | |
Retained for future use | £2.00k |
People

19 Employee(s)
15 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£70k to £80k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Anguilla
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Australia
- Bangladesh
- Barbados
- Belize
- Bermuda
- Botswana
- British Indian Ocean Territory
- British Virgin Islands
- Brunei
- Cameroon
- Canada
- Cayman Islands
- Cyprus
- Dominica
- Eswatini
- Falkland Islands
- Fiji
- Ghana
- Gibraltar
- Grenada
- Guernsey
- Guyana
- India
- Isle Of Man
- Jamaica
- Jersey
- Kenya
- Kiribati
- Lesotho
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Maldives
- Malta
- Mauritius
- Montserrat
- Mozambique
- Namibia
- Nauru
- New Zealand
- Nigeria
- Northern Ireland
- Pakistan
- Papua New Guinea
- Pitcairn, Henderson, Ducie And Oeno Islands
- Rwanda
- Saint Helena
- Saint Vincent
- Samoa
- Scotland
- Seychelles
- Sierra Leone
- Singapore
- Solomon Islands
- South Africa
- South Georgia And South Sandwich Islands
- Sri Lanka
- St Kitts And Nevis
- St Lucia
- Tanzania
- The Bahamas
- The Gambia
- Tonga
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Turks And Caicos Islands
- Tuvalu
- Uganda
- Vanuatu
- Zambia
Governance
- 10 September 1970: Standard registration
- THE SEAFARERS' CHARITY (Working name)
- KING GEORGE'S FUND FOR SAILORS (Previous name)
- SEAFARERS UK (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Gerard Butterworth | Chair | 09 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Julie Tankard | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||
Monica Kohli | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Martyn Gray | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Fleur Bassett | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Deborah Cavaldoro | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Captain Lee Clarke | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
Nigel Blazeby | Trustee | 14 June 2022 |
|
|
||||||||||
William Andrew REID | Trustee | 22 May 2018 |
|
|||||||||||
Peter French | Trustee | 22 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
GERALD EDWARD KIDD | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|||||||||||
Robert John Greenwood | Trustee | 27 April 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
William Ernest Lawes | Trustee | 08 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
NATALIE SHAW | Trustee | 28 April 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||
DUNCAN BAIN | Trustee | 19 May 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.36m | £1.55m | £2.94m | £2.29m | £2.77m | |
|
Total expenditure | £4.24m | £5.51m | £5.39m | £5.07m | £4.30m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £14.68k | £77.51k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.41m | £958.00k | £2.39m | £1.78m | £2.00m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £185.00k | £45.00k | £55.00k | £81.00k | £156.00k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £765.00k | £551.00k | £491.00k | £427.00k | £610.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £3.00k | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £983.00k | £514.00k | £1.09m | £820.00k | £1.42m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £3.05m | £4.64m | £4.12m | £3.61m | £3.05m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.20m | £874.00k | £1.27m | £1.46m | £1.25m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £284.00k | £221.00k | £93.00k | £97.00k | £167.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £3.66m | £3.57m | £2.88m | £2.42m | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £418.00k | £390.00k | £367.00k | £361.00k | £316.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.30m | £4.89m | £4.85m | £4.03m | £3.97m | |
|
Long-term investments | £39.80m | £36.62m | £39.06m | £33.88m | £34.06m | |
|
Other assets | £833.00k | £1.00m | £1.20m | £1.22m | £936.00k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.21m | £964.00k | £778.00k | £697.00k | £525.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 18 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 12 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
ROYAL CHARTER 1/03/1920 AND SUPPLEMENTAL CHARTER 16/05/1949 AS AMENDED BY ORDERS OF THE PRIVY COUNCIL DATED 19/12/1989 AND 28/10/1992 AND ORDER OF THE COMMISSIONERS 25/8/04 AS AMENDED 2/12/2004 AND AMENDED BY ORDER OF THE PRIVY COUNCIL 9/06/2010
Charitable objects
1)THE RELIEF OF SEAFARERS, THEIR FAMILIES OR DEPENDANTS, WHO ARE IN NEED, BY PROVIDING SUPPORT TO ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED WITHIN OR (IN EXCEPTIONAL CIRCUMSTANCES) OUTSIDE THE COMMONWEALTH; (2) THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF PEOPLE OF ANY AGE TO PREPARE FOR WORK OR SERVICE AT SEA, BY PROVIDING SUPPORT TO ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED WITHIN OR (IN EXCEPTIONAL CIRCUMSTANCES) OUTSIDE THE COMMONWEALTH; (3) THE PROMOTION OF THE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF THE MARITIME CHARITABLE SECTOR WITHIN THE COMMONWEALTH; (4) THE PROMOTION OF SAFETY AT SEA BY PROVIDING SUPPORT TO ORGANISATIONS ESTABLISHED WITHIN THE COMMONWEALTH.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND COMMONWEALTH
Linked charities
- A T JEFFRESS FUND
- ADMIRAL LORD CLARENCE PAGET FUND
- ADMIRAL SIR WILLIAM TENNANT FUND
- AULAY WATSON MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIP FUND
- BANKRUPT SEAFARERS' TRUST
- BOWLANDS FUND
- DAVID RICHARDS TRUST
- ENDOWED GENERAL PURPOSES FUND
- H M S KING ALFRED MEMORIAL FUND
- H M S PRINCE OF WALES AND H M S REPULSE MEMORIAL FUND
- HENRY HERBERT WILLS FUND
- JAMES HENRY STEPHENS BEQUEST
- JOHN DARREL BOYD MEMORIAL FUND
- JOHN EDMUND MACKENZIE FUND
- JULIA ELIZA STAUNTON-MASSY
- KGFS FALKLANDS FUND
- KING GEORGE V FUND
- MERCHANT NAVY FUND, SOUTH AFRICA (SCHOLARSHIP FUND)
- MISS B LOANE BEQUEST
- MORLEY FUND
- NAVAL HOME INDUSTRY FUND
- NORMAN SALVESEN BEQUEST FUND
- PROVINCE OF NATAL GIFT FUND
- R K A DRUCE MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIP
- RENNY FUND
- RICHARD WARD FUND
- ROYAL INDIAN NAVY BENEVOLENT FUND
- ROYAL NAVAL OFFICERS' FUND
- ROYAL NAVAL WAR LIBRARIES ENDOWMENT FUND
- SARENA FUND
- SIR HARRY TWYFORD MEMORIAL TRUST
- SOUTH AFRICAN WOMEN'S AUXILIARY SERVICES MEMORIAL SCHOLARSHIP (1939/45)
- SOUTHAMPTON SAILORS' HOME (KING GEORGES' FUND) CHARITY
- STANLEY GROOM FUND
- SUNDRY FUNDS
- SYDNEY THOMAS LETHBRIDGE BEQUEST
- THE GULF TRUST (SEAFARERS)
- THE INGLIS FUND
- W S DAVIDSON TRUST
- WESTMINSTER STORES SCHOLARSHIP
- WILLIAM ROGER VALLANCE MEMORIAL FUND
- 10 September 1970 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Seafarers' Charity
7-8 Hatherley Street
LONDON
SW1P 2QT
- Phone:
- 02079320000
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window