THE LADY CLARE FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
PROVISION OF GRANTS AND LOANS TO HELP FORMER MEMBERS OF CLARE COLLEGE OR THEIR DEPENDANTS IN FINANCIAL DIFFICULTY OR TO PROVIDE FUNDS FOR THEIR FURTHER EDUCATION OR FOR THAT OF THEIR CHILDREN.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Other Finance
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 11 March 1964: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Loretta Caroline Rose Minghella | Chair | 01 October 2021 |
|
|||||||||
REBECCA LOUISE BLAYLOCK | Trustee | 30 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
CHARLOTTE ELLA LOUISE KINGSTON | Trustee | 30 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr William Andrew Foster | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||||||
Dr PATRICIA FARA | Trustee | 19 April 2019 |
|
|||||||||
Donald Peter Hearn | Trustee | 01 December 2016 |
|
|||||||||
Dr Rachael Marian Harris | Trustee | 12 May 2014 |
|
|||||||||
CAITLIN ELIZABETH JENKINS | Trustee | 29 January 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
PROFESSOR ALISON SEATON SINCLAIR | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
ELISABETH MARKSTEINER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||
DR KENNETH FRANKLIN RILEY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.04k | £10.56k | £13.19k | £6.73k | £6.46k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.13k | £6.27k | £5.98k | £17.39k | £8.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 23 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 27 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 10 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 16 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED DATED 30/7/1934
Charitable objects
(A) TO ASSIST POOR FORMER MEMBERS OF CLARE COLLEGE CAMBRIDGE AND THEIR POOR WIVES OR WIDOWS AND DEPENDANTS BY MEANS OF MONEY OR GIFTS OR LOANS OF MONEY. (B) ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE OF BENEFICIARITES. (FOR DATAILS SEE CLAUSE 2 (A) - (C) OF DEED DATED 30/7/1934)
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
CLARE COLLEGE
TRINITY LANE
CAMBRIDGE
CB2 1TL
- Phone:
- 01223333200
- Email:
- bursar@cam.ac.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window