THE PERSEVERANCE TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the study and practice of nursing. In assisting by grants or otherwise any nurses, midwives, persons of hospital staff who are in need through lack of means with a preference of those who have trained at the Nightingale school of Nursing or worked at St Thomas' Hospital.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 June 1963: Standard registration
- 24 August 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £95 | £95 | £95 | £50 | £13.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 11 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 01 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 5 FEBRUARY 1959
Charitable objects
A. TO PROMOTE THE STUDY OF NURSING. B. TO MAINTAIN HOSTELS OR OTHER ACCOMMODATION FOR (I) NURSES, MIDWIVES AND HOSPITAL STAFF ATTENDING A CONFERENCE OR COURSE. (II) RETIRED NURSES ETC. WHO ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE THROUGH AGE, IMPOTENCE OR LACK OF MEANS. C. GRANTS TO NURSES ETC. WHO ARE IN NEED THROUGH LACK OF MEANS. D. ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Linked charities
- 19 June 1963 : Standard registration
- 24 August 2022 : Removed
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window