ST MARY'S PRIORY FERNHAM RESIDUAL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The activities of the charity can be divided into two main areas: caring for the members of the community, including supporting the ministries of the individuals, and the advancement of the Roman Catholic religion-primarily by giving grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- India
- Scotland
- United States
Governance
- 24 October 1963: Standard registration
- ST MARYS PRIORY (Working name)
- ST MARY'S PRIORY (Working name)
- (THE COMMUNITY OF) BENEDICTINE NUNS AT ST MARY'S PRIORY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard John Berkley-Matthews | Trustee | 11 August 2022 |
|
|||||
Richard Hawker | Trustee | 11 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dom Michal Dymitr Mycka | Trustee | 03 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Rev Dom Brendan Patrick Creeden | Trustee | 03 June 2020 |
|
|
||||
Mother Winsome Angela DURRANT | Trustee | 03 June 2020 |
|
|||||
Right Rev Dom David Cuthbert Brogan OSB | Trustee | 20 September 2019 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £436.35k | £235.03k | £268.27k | £515.69k | £203.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £244.89k | £732.95k | £1.19m | £2.54m | £1.49m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £264.16k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | N/A | £251.53k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.49m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £48.31k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | N/A | £20.64k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | N/A | £2.38m | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | N/A | £48.31k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 27 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 16 MAY 1963 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 1 DECEMBER 1998 AND DEED OF VARIATION DATED 7 MARCH 2003 .
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ADVANCE THE RELIGIOUS OR OTHER CHARITABLE WORK FOR THE TIME BEING CARRIED ON BY OR UNDER THE DIRECTION OF THE COMMUNITY AND IF AT ANY TIME THE COMMUNITY SHALL CEASE TO EXIST OR SHALL CEASE TO CARRY ON OR DIRECT ANY CHARITABLE WORK THEN FOR SUCH CHARITY PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
St Michael's Abbey
280 Farnborough Road
Farnborough
Hampshire
GU14 7NQ
- Phone:
- 01252546105
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window