ESSEX UNITARIAN CHAPEL AND MINISTER'S HOUSE

Charity number: 230789
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

We provide weekly public worship and organise a regular programme of liberal religious and spiritual education activities for adults and children. We offer a wide range of rites of passage ceremonies. We support social action activities and other charities in their work. We encourage interfaith dialogue. We provide social and emotional support to church members and organise social activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £240,194
Total expenditure: £138,148

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Kensington And Chelsea

Governance

Registration history:
  • 18 April 1986: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ESSEX CHURCH (Working name)
  • ESSEX UNITARIAN CHURCH (Working name)
  • KENSINGTON UNITARIANS (Working name)
  • ESSEX STREET CHAPEL AND ENDOWMENTS (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Elizabeth Tuckwell Chair 26 October 2022
None on record
Dr Patricia Ann Brewerton Trustee 26 October 2022
None on record
Brian Edward Ellis Trustee 01 March 2017
None on record
MS HEIDI FERID-HANDS Trustee
None on record
HAROLD LORENZELLI Trustee
None on record
HOWARD RICHARD HAGUE Trustee
DR DANIEL WILLIAMS (COMMONLY KNOWN AS DR WILLIAMS'S TRUST)
Received: 51 days late
The British and Foreign Unitarian Association (Incorporated) Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £177.29k £133.02k £135.25k £172.69k £240.19k
Total expenditure £155.34k £132.51k £122.00k £161.49k £138.15k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 25 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 12 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 25 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 25 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED 17 JUNE 1976 AND SCHEME OF 18 APRIL 1986
Charitable objects
FOT PAYMENT OF THE CHOIR SINGERS FROM TIME TO TIME
Area of benefit
KENSINGTON
Registration history
  • 18 April 1986 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Essex Unitarian Church
Palace Gardens Terrace
LONDON
W8 4RT
Phone:
02072216514