SIR MOSES MONTEFIORE FOR COALS AND BLANKETS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide fuel grants for deserving poor Jews
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2022
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 18 June 1963: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BERNARD MOCATTA | Chair |
|
||||||
LUCIEN GUBBAY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DAVID DANGOOR | Trustee |
|
||||||
CAROLINE HAYIM | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2018 | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.00k | £4.71k | £3.84k | £4.40k | £4.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.79k | £1.20k | £1.00k | £5.00k | £7.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 250 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 250 days | |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 18 September 2023 | 18 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 30 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 30 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 07 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL PROVED P.P.R. ON 18TH AUGUST 1885 AND SCHEMES OF THE 29TH MAY 1958, 11TH JANUARY 1967 AND SCHEME OF THE 7TH AUGUST 1969
Charitable objects
PROVIDING COALS AND BLANKETS FOR DESERVING POOR JEWS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
SPANISH & PORTUGESE JEWS CONGR
2 ASHWORTH ROAD
MAIDA VALE
LONDON
W9 1JY
- Phone:
- 02072892573
- Email:
- accounts@sephardi.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window