Financial history THE HINDU CENTRE - LONDON

Charity number: 231505
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £21.34k £9.99k £11.29k £15.81k £20.17k
Total expenditure £21.34k £3.88k £2.16k £3.95k £2.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A