ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF BEVERLEY ST MARY CHURCH ESTATE

Charity number: 232344
Charity reporting is up to date (21 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity helps maintain the historic church of St Marys, Beverley for religious worship and for public events. The charity also enables the building to be kept open to the general public throughout the year.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £37,333
Total expenditure: £25,983

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • East Riding Of Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 24 October 1968: Standard registration
  • 24 February 1996: Removed
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CHURCH ESTATE CHARITY (Working name)
  • ST MARY'S CHURCHWARDENS (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Allan Stanley Ball Trustee 30 May 2022
None on record
Keith Gilson Trustee 28 March 2021
TWO CHURCHES ONE TOWN
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, BEVERLEY
Received: On time
Jill Francis Edmond Trustee 01 October 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, BEVERLEY
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF ST. MARY'S CHURCH , BEVERLEY
Received: On time
CHRISTOPHER LLOYD DIGBY MUNDAY Trustee 18 December 2018
THE BEVERLEY AND DISTRICT RINGING SOCIETY BELL REPAIR FUND
Received: On time
THE JOSEPH AND ANNIE CATTLE TRUST
Received: On time
THE FRIENDS OF ST. MARY'S CHURCH , BEVERLEY
Received: On time
GILLIAN BRENDA GREGORY Trustee 22 April 2018
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY, BEVERLEY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £48.23k £156.65k £39.01k £36.67k £37.33k
Total expenditure £49.58k £153.60k £255.90k £23.03k £25.98k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 21 November 2024 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 21 November 2024 21 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 03 July 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 12 September 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 21 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 22 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 15 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 15 September 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
WILL PROVED AT BIRMINGHAM 2 MARCH 1940
Charitable objects
GENERAL PURPOSES IN CONNECTION WITH BEVERLEY, ST. MARY.
Area of benefit
ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST. MARY, BEVERLEY
Registration history
  • 24 October 1968 : Standard registration
  • 24 February 1996 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
60 RIPLINGHAM ROAD
KIRK ELLA
HULL
HU10 7TR
Phone:
07854246903
Website:

No information available