GLOUCESTERSHIRE WILDLIFE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Wildlife Conservation
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£5,456,524
Donations and legacies | £1.72m | |
Charitable activities | £2.83m | |
Other trading activities | £726.92k | |
Investments | £54.02k | |
Other | £127.13k |
Total expenditure:
£5,161,676
Raising funds | £1.32m | |
Charitable activities | £3.84m | |
Other | £0 |
£11,051 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £219,936 from 8 government contract(s) and £1,396,090 from 33 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.32m | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.84m | |
Retained for future use | £294.85k |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.32m | |
Charitable expenditure | £3.84m | |
Retained for future use | £305.90k |
People

109 Employee(s)
11 Trustee(s)
560 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Gloucestershire
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 28 April 1964: Standard registration
- 14 May 2021: Funds received from 271022 THE GUTHRIE ESSAME CHARITABLE TRUST
- 23 August 2021: Funds received from 1069695 THE SIMPSON EDUCATION AND CONSERVATION TRUST
- 20 December 2022: Funds received from 299418 UPPER THAMES PROTECTION SOCIETY
- 24 July 2024: Funds received from 1094746 SOUTH WEST WILDLIFE TRUSTS
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Kathryn Anne Monk | Trustee | 21 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Amy Rose Walsh | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Emma Mary Louise Waldron | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|||||
Barry Trevor Wyatt | Trustee | 17 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Nicola Spencer | Trustee | 05 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard White | Trustee | 05 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr David Bullock | Trustee | 05 October 2019 |
|
|||||
ANDREW JAMES BLUETT | Trustee | 29 September 2018 |
|
|||||
Jane Furze | Trustee | 25 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN CHARLES HORWOOD | Trustee | 12 November 2016 |
|
|||||
Dr SALLY CATHERINE BYNG | Trustee | 12 November 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £4.53m | £4.79m | £4.87m | £5.59m | £5.46m | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.94m | £3.53m | £4.37m | £4.88m | £5.16m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £321.38k | £726.12k | £202.46k | £228.90k | £219.94k | |
|
Income from government grants | £985.81k | £796.67k | £1.13m | £987.04k | £1.40m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.58m | £2.03m | £1.98m | £2.61m | £1.72m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £670.98k | £618.97k | £863.36k | £724.21k | £726.92k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £2.27m | £2.14m | £2.01m | £2.08m | £2.83m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £11.80k | £9.37k | £11.07k | £22.80k | £54.02k | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £151.98k | £127.13k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £193.21k | £617.08k | £389.73k | £1.04m | £128.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.86m | £2.71m | £3.16m | £3.57m | £3.84m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £1.08m | £825.42k | £1.21m | £605.95k | £1.32m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £371.41k | £343.58k | £469.80k | £542.84k | £1.45m | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £178.75k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £7.40k | £6.20k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £704.20k | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £4.37m | £4.69m | £4.99m | £4.86m | £4.79m | |
|
Long-term investments | £412.58k | £659.11k | £2.48m | £679.86k | £704.39k | |
|
Other assets | £1.97m | £2.46m | £2.42m | £3.48m | £3.75m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£91.97k | -£59.17k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £1.16m | £892.76k | £2.66m | £1.15m | £1.13m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 05 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 06 NOV 1961 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16 JAN 1969 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 29 JAN 1970 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21 JAN 1971 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 24 MAR 1973 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 SEP 1976 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04 NOV 1978 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25 NOV 1980 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01 JUN 1996 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 20 NOV 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 16 NOV 2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 22 NOV 2014 as amended on 05 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
(1) TO RECORD & STUDY PLACES AND OBJECTS OF ORNITHOLOGICAL, ENTOMOLOGICAL, BOTANICAL, ECOLOGICAL, ZOOLOGICAL, GEOLOGICAL, ARCHAEOLOGICAL OR SCIENTIFIC INTEREST, OR OF NATURAL BEAUTY, AND TO PROTECT THESE FROM INJURY, ILL TREATMENT OR DESTRUCTION. (2) TO ESTABLISH, FORM, OWN, MAINTAIN AND MANAGE SANCTUARIES OR NATURE RESERVES FOR THE CONSERVATION AND CONTROL OF WILD PLANTS AND OTHER VEGETATION AND OF THE WILD CREATURES OF ANY DESCRIPTION LIVING NATURALLY THEREIN. (3) TO ENCOURAGE THE BREEDING AND PRESERVATION OF WILD BIRDS, ANIMALS, PLANTS OR INSECTS WHICH ARE HARMLESS, USEFUL BEAUTIFUL, OR RARE. TO PROMOTE, ORGANIZE, CARRY ON AND ENCOURAGE STUDY AND RESEARCH FOR THE ADVANCEMENT OF KNOWLEDGE IN THE NATURAL SCIENCES, AND TO MAKE GRANTS OR DONATIONS FOR SUCH PURPOSES.(5) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN (A) THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTISE OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT, (B) THE PRINCIPLE AND PRACTISE OF BIODIVERSITY CONSERVATION (5) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC CONCERNING RECYCLING AND WASTE MANAGEMENT INCLUDING THOROUGH PROGRAMS OF TEACHING, TRAINING, PUBLISHING, EXHIBITIONS, AND SEMINARS AND OTHER MEANS FOR PROVIDING PUBLIC KNOWLEDGE AND INFORMATION (6) TO PROMOTE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION, PRESERVATION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT BY THE PRODUCTION OF SUSTAINABLE WASTE MANAGEMENT PRACTICES, RECYCLING AND REUSE OF GOODS, INCLUDING PROMOTING THE EFFECTIVENESS AND EFFICIENCY OF RECYCLING WASTE PRODUCTS
Area of benefit
COUNTY OF GLOUCESTERSHIRE AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
CONSERVATION CENTRE
RESERVOIR ROAD
GLOUCESTER
GL4 6SX
- Phone:
- 01452383333
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window