LIVERPOOL ROMAN CATHOLIC ARCHDIOCESAN TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide support to the clergy in training, ministry and retirement To support pastoral work in parishes and local communities To support and direct lifelong Christian education in parishes and schools To preserve and invest in the property infrastructure of the Archdiocese and parishes, facilitating worship and enabling the charitable work of the Church to take place
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2022
Total income:
£38,620,950
Donations and legacies | £24.28m | |
Charitable activities | £1.22m | |
Other trading activities | £9.02m | |
Investments | £4.00m | |
Other | £102.13k |
Total expenditure:
£41,545,710
Raising funds | £8.96m | |
Charitable activities | £32.58m | |
Other | £0 |
-£10,650,048 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £12,862,078 from 1 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £8.96m | |
Charitable expenditure | £32.58m |
People

469 Employee(s)
14 Trustee(s)
1000 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 6 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Halton
- Knowsley
- Lancashire
- Liverpool City
- Sefton
- St Helens
- Warrington
- Wigan
- Isle Of Man
- Peru
Governance
- 23 August 1965: Standard registration
- 12 November 2012: Funds received from 1096399 THE BOB PARRY LOURDES FOUNDATION
- 17 December 2015: Funds received from 1019976 WIDNES CATHOLIC ACTION GROUP
- 04 January 2017: Funds received from 222130 THE JOHN RANKIN TRUST FOR LIVERPOOL CATHOLIC CLERG...
- 28 March 2024: Funds received from 1101866 ST CUTHBERT'S SOCIETY, USHAW
- ARCHDIOCESE OF LIVERPOOL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Most Reverend Malcolm McMahon | Chair | 01 May 2014 |
|
|||||||||||||
Rev GRAEME MICHAEL DUNNE | Trustee | 18 June 2024 |
|
|||||||||||||
Rev GERARD JAMES CALLACHER | Trustee | 19 December 2023 |
|
|||||||||||||
Rev Canon Aidan Prescott | Trustee | 27 May 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Ian Hollows | Trustee | 05 November 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Carol LAWRENCE | Trustee | 05 November 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||
Colette O'Brien | Trustee | 05 November 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||
Graeme Michael Easton | Trustee | 05 November 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||
Sean Christopher Keyes | Trustee | 05 November 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||
Rev Canon Michael Fitzsimons | Trustee | 24 October 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rev Matthew Nunes | Trustee | 22 September 2016 |
|
|
||||||||||||
Rt Rev THOMAS NEYLON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||
Rev PHILIP INCH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||||
REV Provost ANTHONY O'BRIEN | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £33.93m | £31.73m | £20.41m | £35.09m | £38.62m | |
|
Total expenditure | £36.71m | £35.03m | £28.03m | £36.15m | £41.55m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £180.50k | N/A | £770.94k | £12.28m | £12.86m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £13.38m | £11.75m | £8.16m | £22.32m | £24.28m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £12.83m | £12.03m | £5.18m | £6.09m | £9.02m | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.59m | £1.57m | £1.37m | £1.65m | £1.22m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £5.72m | £6.09m | £4.91m | £4.95m | £4.00m | |
|
Income - Other | £417.09k | £283.12k | £793.41k | £88.12k | £102.13k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £1.00m | £300.39k | £456.43k | £1.39m | £1.14m | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £24.14m | £23.16m | £20.07m | £28.81m | £32.58m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £12.57m | £11.88m | £7.96m | £7.35m | £8.96m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £138.25k | £146.71k | £147.18k | £190.80k | £240.61k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £95.39k | £29.38k | £75.72k | £36.89k | £32.08k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £161.79k | £357.01k | £303.45k | £379.48k | £429.99k | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £58.89m | £60.52m | £61.01m | £62.97m | £27.95m | |
|
Long-term investments | £116.95m | £131.81m | £125.17m | £138.44m | £166.79m | |
|
Other assets | £23.88m | £23.23m | £31.05m | £34.87m | £31.25m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £12.44m | £12.27m | £24.96m | £14.65m | £14.33m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 210 days | |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 14 July 2023 | 256 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 14 July 2023 | 256 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 31 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 18 MAR 1963 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 29 JUN 1968 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 13 SEP 1995
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION IN THE DIOCESE IN SUCH WAYS BEING CHARITABLE AS THE ARCHBISHOP SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DIRECT AND FOR THE SERVICE AND SUPPORT WHETHER IN THE DIOCESE OR OUTSIDE THE DIOCESE IN SUCH WAYS AS AFORESAID OF ANY LAWFUL CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHETHER EDUCATIONAL OR OTHERWISE PROMOTED OR SUPPORTED BY THE CHURCH.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
LIVERPOOL ARCHDIOCESE
St Margaret Clitherow Centre
CROXTETH DRIVE
LIVERPOOL
L17 1AA
- Phone:
- 01515221020
- Email:
- webmaster@rcaol.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window