Financial history DYFED CAERFYRDDIN FEDERATION OF WOMEN'S INSTITUTES

Charity number: 232774
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £83.61k £85.75k £75.24k £84.00k £112.40k
Total expenditure £88.27k £81.46k £74.00k £82.58k £122.44k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £6.50k £1.50k N/A N/A