ROYAL NATIONAL MISSION TO DEEP SEA FISHERMEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Fishermen's Mission maintains a Christian presence in United Kingdom's fishing communities, in order to provide, regardless of race or creed, practical, welfare and spiritual support to active and retired fishermen and their families. In particular it provides a 24/7 emergency service in event of accidents to fishermen.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
Total income:
£3,282,428
Donations and legacies | £2.48m | |
Charitable activities | £182.24k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £315.00k | |
Other | £304.63k |
Total expenditure:
£3,555,517
Raising funds | £1.15m | |
Charitable activities | £2.40m | |
Other | £0 |
£1,409,645 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.15m | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.40m |
Raising funds and other expenditure | £1.15m | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.40m | |
Retained for future use | £1.14m |
People

68 Employee(s)
10 Trustee(s)
212 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£80k to £90k | 1 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- FISHERMENS MISSION (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elspeth Mary Macdonald | Trustee | 01 October 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Mark John Stubbings | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Mark Ian Adrian Greet | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Wilma Robertson Forbes Goodlad | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Deanne Marie Thomas | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Alicia Anne Moyles | Trustee | 18 April 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Nathan de Rozarieux | Trustee | 29 April 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||
Rev Derath May Durkin LLB | Trustee | 29 April 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
TREVOR ERNEST JAMES | Trustee | 12 April 2016 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||
REV David Lacy DL | Trustee | 04 April 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.28m | £3.01m | £2.35m | £3.00m | £3.28m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.94m | £2.85m | £3.28m | £3.75m | £3.56m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £2.87m | £2.58m | £1.78m | £2.52m | £2.48m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £55.39k | £77.78k | £115.29k | £129.25k | £182.24k | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £299.86k | £310.30k | £300.00k | £300.00k | £315.00k | |
|
Income - Other | £54.49k | £50.88k | £158.23k | £51.60k | £304.63k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £1.12m | £1.06m | £265.80k | £1.01m | £895.28k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.05m | £1.89m | £2.21m | £2.75m | £2.40m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £886.44k | £957.04k | £1.07m | £999.72k | £1.15m | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £58.99k | £59.47k | £76.88k | £102.60k | £86.35k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £1.76m | £1.63m | £1.56m | £1.52m | £1.47m | |
|
Long-term investments | £12.13m | £12.87m | £10.98m | £10.38m | £12.02m | |
|
Other assets | £931.56k | £904.94k | £597.25k | £611.80k | £204.90k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | -£380.00k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £84.19k | £78.40k | £92.21k | £141.92k | £180.48k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | 07 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 28 March 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 06 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 06 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM OF ASSOCIATION DATED 25TH MAY 1887 ADOPTED 23RD MAY 1954 AS AMENDED 8TH DECEMBER 1966, 22ND OCTOBER 1980, 25TH APRIL 1990, 21ST NOVEMBER 1990, 18TH DECEMBER 1996 AND 7 MARCH 2008 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 12 MAY 2016 as amended on 27 May 2020
Charitable objects
TO ESTABLISH AND MAINTAIN A PRESENCE IN BRITISH ISLES FISHING PORTS WHERE FISHERMEN AND THEIR FAMILIES CAN RECEIVE SPIRITUAL AND MATERIAL HELP.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Fishermens Mission
Mather House
4400 Parkway
Whiteley
FAREHAM
- Phone:
- 01489566910
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window