LINCOLN ALMSHOUSES CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides almshouse accommodation for people in need of housing. Preference given to the poor of Loughton and those who have been members of Loughton Union Church for a period of ten years.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Essex
Governance
- 13 May 1964: Standard registration
- CHARITY OF HENRY LINCOLN FOR ALMSHOUSES (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Linda Campbell | Trustee | 29 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Ramesh Modasia | Trustee | 28 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Alan Beavis | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Lesley Wilson | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Kevin Campbell | Trustee | 09 March 2020 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.26k | £22.60k | £23.44k | £23.02k | £25.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.25k | £7.73k | £4.38k | £6.50k | £24.37k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL OF 10 MAY 1910 AND INDENTURE OF 13 NOVEMBER 1913 (U V 178 P 126; U V 171 P 394)
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS IN LOUGHTON OR NEIGHBOURING DISTRICTS OF 50 YEARS AND OVER, PREFERENCE BEING GIVEN TO PERSONS WHO HAVE ATTENDED THE LOUGHTON UNION CHURCH FOR 10 YEARS
Area of benefit
LOUGHTON AND NEIGHBOURING DISTRICT
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 Alderton Way
Loughton
IG10 3EQ
- Phone:
- 02085021379
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window